Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Falangola

Deceased

Bishop of Caserta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1699Born
19 Dec 172222.9Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jul 173636.5AppointedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
15 Jul 173636.5Ordained BishopBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
29 May 174747.4AppointedBishop of Caserta, Italy
25 Mar 176161.2DiedBishop of Caserta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Falangola
Bishop Antonio Falangola (born , died ) Bishop of Caserta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSorrento

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1750
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1736, Number 26
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 152, and Page 401

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018