Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Filippo Consoli

Deceased

Bishop of Amelia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1700³BornTerra di Visso
18 Sep 172828.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Nov 174141.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
30 Nov 174141.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
9 Dec 174141.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Acquapendente, Italy
2 Dec 174343.6AppointedBishop of Amelia, Italy
Jul 1770³70.2DiedBishop of Amelia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Filippo Consoli:
Bishop Giacomo Filippo Consoli (born ) Bishop of Amelia

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1770
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 79, and Page 92
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 224

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 4 Oct 2013