Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Centurione

Deceased

Bishop of Ajaccio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1686³BornPavomia
27 Nov 174155.2AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
30 Nov 174155.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ajaccio, France
11 Nov 175872.2DiedBishop of Ajaccio, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Centurione:
Bishop Bernardino Centurione (born , died ) Bishop of Ajaccio

  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015