Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marcello Cardinal Crescenzi

Deceased

Archbishop of Ferrara

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1694BornRoma
16 Mar 172025.3Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jul 173944.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
30 Jul 173944.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
10 Aug 173944.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
9 Sep 174348.8Elevated to Cardinal
16 Dec 174349.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina
22 Aug 174651.8AppointedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy
24 Aug 176873.8DiedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marcello Crescenzi:
Marcello Cardinal Crescenzi (born , died ) Archbishop of Ferrara

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
  • a cardinal for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Sep 1743
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015