Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabio Troyli

Deceased

Bishop of Catanzaro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1685BornMontalban
24 Sep 170722.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Sep 170823.1Ordained PriestPriest
1 Dec 173449.3AppointedBishop of Minervino Murge, Italy
12 Dec 173449.3Ordained BishopBishop of Minervino Murge, Italy
1 Feb 175165.4AppointedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
1 Aug 176276.9DiedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fabio Troyli:
Bishop Fabio Troyli (born , died ) Bishop of Catanzaro

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 155, and Page 290
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1734, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015