Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Mazzetti

Deceased

Bishop of Fossano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1709Born
24 Apr 173424.8Ordained PriestPriest
16 Oct 175445.3SelectedBishop of Fossano, Italy
17 Feb 175545.6ConfirmedBishop of Fossano, Italy
23 Feb 175545.6Ordained BishopBishop of Fossano, Italy
1761¹51.5DiedBishop of Fossano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Mazzetti
Bishop Filippo Mazzetti (born , died 1761) Bishop of Fossano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaluggia

  • a priest for 26.6 years
  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 219
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast