Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi d’Alessandro

Deceased

Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1693BornPortici
19 Sep 171623.2Ordained PriestPriest
7 May 173238.8AppointedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
11 May 173238.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
15 Jul 174350.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Alessano, Italy
16 Sep 175461.2AppointedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
28 Jan 177076.6DiedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi d’Alessandro:
Archbishop Luigi d’Alessandro (born , died ) Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 37.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 75, and Page 116
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 378

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015