Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Manerba (Malerba)

Deceased

Bishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1687BornCorato
1 May 171123.3Ordained PriestPriest
25 May 173547.4AppointedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
5 Jun 173547.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
Sep 1761³73.7DiedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Manerba (Malerba):
Bishop Antonio Manerba (Malerba) (born , died Sep 1761) Bishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 84
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015