Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fabio Colloredo, C.O. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Lucca, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1672Born
16 Jul 169220.4ProfessedMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
7 Apr 169624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
19 Nov 173159.7AppointedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
16 Dec 173159.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
15 Nov 174270.7DiedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fabio Colloredo
Archbishop Fabio Colloredo C.O. (born , died ) Archbishop of Lucca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColloredo

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1742
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 265
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1731, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast