Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Scarampi

Deceased

Bishop of Vigevano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1726BornCortemiglia
30 Nov 174216.7Ordained PriestPriest
25 May 175731.2SelectedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
18 Jul 175731.4ConfirmedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
25 Jul 175731.4Ordained BishopBishop of Vigevano, Italy
18 Feb 180174.9DiedBishop of Vigevano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Scarampi:
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Scarampi (born , died ) Bishop of Vigevano

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 43.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1770
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 442
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 20 Nov 2015