Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcello Filomarini

Deceased

Bishop of Mileto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Nov 1692BornNapoli
2 May 173441.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Sep 173441.9AppointedBishop of Mileto, Italy
3 Oct 173441.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mileto, Italy
13 Mar 175663.4DiedBishop of Mileto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marcello Filomarini:
Bishop Marcello Filomarini (died ) Bishop of Mileto

  • a priest for 21.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 288

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013