Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Paderborn

Archidioecesis Paderbornensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Udo Markus Bentz, Archbishop
  • Josef Holtkotte, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Matthias König, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Dominicus (Michael) Meier, O.S.B., Auxiliary Bishop
  • Hans-Josef Becker, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Hubert Berenbrinker, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Manfred Grothe, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Territory Added: 3 February 1921
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Germany
  • Square Kilometers: 14,750 (5,697 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.erzbistum-paderborn.de/
  • Mailing Address: Erzbischofliches Generalvikariat, Domplatz 3, D-33098 Paderborn, Bundesrepublik Deutschland
  • Telephone: (05251)1250
  • Fax: 12.51.470

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Paderborn
799ErectedDiocese of Paderborn (erected)
6 August 1793Territory LostDiocese of Paderborn Diocese of Corvey (erected)
16 August 1821Territory AddedVicariate Apostolic of Nordic Missions Diocese of Osnabrück
Diocese of Paderborn
Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau)
16 August 1821Territory AddedDiocese of Corvey (suppressed) Diocese of Paderborn
1 March 1921Territory AddedVicariate Apostolic of Anhalt (suppressed) Diocese of Paderborn
Archdiocese of Paderborn
3 February 1921Territory AddedDiocese of Münster (Wenceslaus Havelt Estates) Archdiocese of Paderborn
13 August 1930ElevatedDiocese of Paderborn Archdiocese of Paderborn
13 August 1930Territory AddedVicariate Apostolic of North German Missions {Germania Settentrionale} (suppressed) Diocese of Osnabrück
Archdiocese of Paderborn
27 November 1931Territory AddedArchdiocese of Köln {Cologne} (Auf dem Dümpel, Piene, Strasse, and Neuenschmiede) Archdiocese of Paderborn
27 November 1931Territory LostArchdiocese of Paderborn (Berg, Bieber, Clemens, and Stracke) Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}
2 January 1932Territory AddedDiocese of Fulda (Towns of Borussici, Höringhausen, Eimelrod, Hemmighausen, and Deisfeld) Archdiocese of Paderborn
22 April 1932Territory AddedArchdiocese of Köln {Cologne} (Eiberg in Essen) Archdiocese of Paderborn
24 March 1933Territory LostArchdiocese of Paderborn (Rönsahl) Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}
6 June 1936Territory LostArchdiocese of Paderborn (Gennebreck) Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}
1 April 1939Territory LostArchdiocese of Paderborn (Part of B. Mary Assumption into Heaven in Gelsenkirchen-Rotthausen) Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}
14 March 1942Territory LostArchdiocese of Paderborn (Hesslingen and Hehlingen) Diocese of Hildesheim
14 March 1942Territory AddedDiocese of Hildesheim (Calvoerde) Archdiocese of Paderborn
23 February 1957Territory LostArchdiocese of Köln {Cologne}
Diocese of Münster
Archdiocese of Paderborn
Diocese of Essen (erected) (Bochum, Bottrop, Duisburg, Essen, Gelsenkirchen, Gladbeck, Lüdenscheid, and Mülhein (in Ruhr), Oberhausen, Wattenscheid; rural districts of Altena and Ennepe-Ruhrkreis (except Her decke and Wetter))
23 July 1973Territory LostArchdiocese of Paderborn Apostolic Administration of Magdeburg (erected)
7 December 2006Territory LostArchdiocese of Paderborn (St. Teresa of Jesus Infante (in Evingsen)) Diocese of Essen

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Paderborn
19502,345,3449,382,32325.0%1,4544641,9181,2226526,955605ap1951
19702,339,2118,823,43226.5%1,8624152,2771,0274384,700647ap1971
19802,024,5005,200,00038.9%1,2623621,6241,246184634,173548ap1981
19901,869,4204,661,00040.1%1,1972791,4761,266713743,483567ap1991
19991,829,8555,106,04435.8%1,1551371,2921,4161042012,601568ap2000
20001,816,3305,109,41035.5%1,1391611,3001,3971132272,478570ap2001
20011,796,5915,115,82135.1%1,135921,2271,4641111562,253570ap2002
20021,786,3304,934,40836.2%1,126841,2101,4761161472,269571ap2003
20031,771,6604,900,00036.2%1,110811,1911,4871291372,272571ap2004
20041,757,4744,900,00035.9%1,074781,1521,5251291272,173571ap2005
20131,596,4054,856,34232.9%9261111,0371,5391721621,548559ap2014
20161,549,2304,785,89832.4%854869401,6481821271,343524ap2017
20191,491,8564,828,54530.9%790828721,7101761151,146484ap2020
20211,495,1254,849,15030.8%732507821,911128821,098458ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Paderborn
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 385
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 210
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 266, and Page 267
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 270
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 303
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 324
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 299, to Page 300
  • Archdiocese of Paderborn
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 13, Page 132
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 23, Page 34, to Page 41
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 24, Page 116, and Page 117
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 24, Page 404
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 34, Page 202, and Page 203

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 15 Apr 2024