Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Holtkotte

Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

Titular Bishop of Simingi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1963 Born
2 Jun 199027.1Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
23 Jun 202158.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
23 Jun 202158.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Simingi
26 Sep 202158.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Simingi

MicroData Summary for Josef Holtkotte
Bishop Josef Holtkotte (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastrop-Rauxel, Archdiocese of Paderborn
Ordained BishopCathedral, Paderborn, Archdiocese of Paderborn

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Paderborn.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Jun 2021
  • ob/c2: CB, 23 Jun 2021
  • c34: CB, 20 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Sep 2021

Quantcast