Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Schneider

Deceased

Bishop of Paderborn, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1847Born
28 Jul 187224.8Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
10 May 190052.6SelectedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
25 Jun 190052.8ConfirmedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
15 Aug 190052.9Ordained BishopBishop of Paderborn, Germany
31 Aug 190961.9DiedBishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Schneider
Bishop Wilhelm Schneider (born , died ) Bishop of Paderborn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGerlingen
Ordained BishopCathedral, Paderborn, Diocese of Paderborn

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 435
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 28, Number 1,569
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 29, Number 1,675

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast