Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Josef Duschak, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Calapan, Philippines

Titular Bishop of Abidda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1903Born
29 May 193027.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
12 Jul 195148.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Calapan, Philippines
12 Jul 195148.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Abidda
21 Sep 195148.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abidda
26 Nov 197370.5ResignedVicar Apostolic of Calapan, Philippines
5 May 199793.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Calapan, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Josef Duschak
Bishop Wilhelm Josef Duschak S.V.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Calapan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWeitmar, Germany

  • a priest for 66.9 years
  • a bishop for 45.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1951, Number 95
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast