Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Ymminck, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

Titular Bishop of Tiflis


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Jul 1469AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
10 Jul 1469AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiflis
24 Feb 1470Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiflis
1472AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
1484ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
14 Apr 1493DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Johannes Ymminck
Bishop Johannes Ymminck O.S.A. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGeseke
Ordained BishopHospice Teutonique, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 249
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,507
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1470, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast