Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin Henninghaus, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Southern Shantung {Scian-Ton Meridionale}, China

Titular Bishop of Hypaepa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1862Born
11 Oct 187917.0ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Word
30 May 188522.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
13 Aug 190441.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Shantung {Scian-Ton Meridionale}, China
13 Aug 190441.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Hypaepa
30 Oct 190442.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hypaepa
23 Jun 193572.7RetiredVicar Apostolic of Yenchowfu, China
20 Jul 193976.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Yenchowfu, China

MicroData Summary for Augustin Henninghaus (VIAF: 5734458)
Bishop Augustin Henninghaus S.V.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Southern Shantung {Scian-Ton Meridionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMenden, Diocese of Paderborn, Germany
Ordained BishopYenchowfu, Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Shantung {Scian-Ton Meridionale}
Death PlaceYenchowfu, Vicariate Apostolic of Yenchowfu

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1904, Number 55
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 9 Jan 2020
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,109, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast