Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Hillebrand

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

Titular Bishop of Ceramus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1874Born
16 Apr 189823.6Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
27 Apr 192651.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
27 Apr 192651.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Ceramus
29 Jun 192651.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ceramus
28 Sep 193157.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Hillebrand (VIAF: 64767374)
Bishop Johannes Hillebrand (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSteinheim

  • a priest for 33.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1926, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast