Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Gap (-Embrun)

Dioecesis Vapincensis (-Ebrodunensis)



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Gap
5th CenturyErectedDiocese of Gap (erected)
29 November 1801SuppressedDiocese of Gap (suppressed) Diocese of Digne
Diocese of Grenoble
Diocese of Gap
6 October 1822RestoredDiocese of Gap
8 December 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Gap (from Aix)
Diocese of Gap (-Embrun)
31 December 2007Name ChangedDiocese of Gap Diocese of Gap (-Embrun) (added Embrun as secondary title)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Gap
195080,00085,00094.1%1533156512475201ap1951
196989,00092,00096.7%1287135659724063ap1971
198083,300103,70080.3%104811274310246202ap1981
199095,700112,00085.4%8979699617178202ap1991
199996,900114,50084.6%821799978123147202ap2000
2000100,000121,41982.4%7615911,098231144202ap2001
2001100,000121,25382.5%7616921,086230139202ap2002
2002100,000121,25382.5%7214861,162428143202ap2003
2003100,000121,25382.5%7115861,162429142202ap2004
2004100,000121,25382.5%6917861,162431142202ap2005
2006114,000126,80089.9%648721,583411137202ap2007
Diocese of Gap (-Embrun)

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 15 Oct 2013