Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Aimé-Victor-François Cardinal Guilbert

Deceased

Archbishop of Bordeaux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1812BornCerisy-la-Forêt
17 Dec 183624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Coutances, France
25 May 186754.5SelectedBishop of Gap, France
20 Sep 186754.8ConfirmedBishop of Gap, France
10 Nov 186755.0Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
26 Nov 186755.0InstalledBishop of Gap, France
8 Sep 187966.8SelectedBishop of Amiens, France
22 Sep 187966.9ConfirmedBishop of Amiens, France
26 Jun 188370.6SelectedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
9 Aug 188370.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
24 May 188976.5Elevated to Cardinal
16 Aug 188976.8DiedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France

MicroData Summary for Aimé-Victor-François Guilbert:
Cardinal Aimé-Victor-François Guilbert (born , died ) Archbishop of Bordeaux

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
  • a cardinal for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 94, and Page 162
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 582
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 May 1889

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013