Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Annet de Pérouse

Deceased

Bishop of Gap, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1699¹Born
29 Jun 175455.4SelectedBishop of Gap, France
17 Feb 175556.1ConfirmedBishop of Gap, France
16 Mar 175556.2Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
18 Jul 176364.5DiedBishop of Gap, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Annet de Pérouse
Bishop Pierre-Annet de Pérouse (born 1699, died ) Bishop of Gap

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVienne

  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 431

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast