Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marie-Ludovic Roche

Deceased

Bishop of Gap, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1828Born
20 Dec 185123.8Ordained PriestPriest
8 Sep 187951.5SelectedBishop of Gap, France
22 Sep 187951.6ConfirmedBishop of Gap, France
11 Nov 187951.7Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
11 Dec 187951.8InstalledBishop of Gap, France
6 Oct 188052.6DiedBishop of Gap, France

MicroData Summary for Marie-Ludovic Roche
Bishop Marie-Ludovic Roche (born , died ) Bishop of Gap

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSerrières
Ordained BishopSte Clotilde, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 28.7 years
  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 582
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast