Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Narbonne-Lara

Deceased

Bishop of Evreux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1722¹BornAubiac
30 Oct 176341.8SelectedBishop of Gap, France
20 Feb 176442.1ConfirmedBishop of Gap, France
25 Mar 176442.2Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
15 Dec 177351.9SelectedBishop of Evreux, France
14 Jan 177452.0ResignedBishop of Gap, France
18 Apr 177452.2ConfirmedBishop of Evreux, France
12 Nov 179270.8DiedBishop of Evreux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François de Narbonne-Lara:
Bishop François de Narbonne-Lara (born 1722, died ) Bishop of Evreux

  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 204, and Page 431
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 20 Dec 2015