Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges Lagrange

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gap


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1929BornChâtillon-sur-Chalaronne
29 Jun 195525.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 198858.6AppointedBishop of Gap, France
18 Sep 198858.8Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
18 Nov 200374.0ResignedBishop of Gap, France
11 Dec 201485.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Gap, France

MicroData Summary for Georges Lagrange:
Bishop Georges Lagrange (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gap

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,814
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 11 Dec 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 12 Dec 2014