Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Prosper-Amable Berthet

Deceased

Bishop of Gap


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1838BornLa Grave
23 Jun 186123.3Ordained PriestPriest of Gap, France
24 Apr 188951.2SelectedBishop of Gap, France
27 May 188951.3ConfirmedBishop of Gap, France
1 Aug 188951.5Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
25 Oct 191476.7DiedBishop of Gap, France

MicroData Summary for Prosper-Amable Berthet:
Bishop Prosper-Amable Berthet (born , died ) Bishop of Gap

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 582

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013