Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Gaspard de Jouffroy de Gonssans

Deceased

Bishop of Le Mans


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1723BornGonssans
15 Dec 177350.3SelectedBishop of Gap, France
28 Feb 177450.5ConfirmedBishop of Gap, France
20 Mar 177450.5Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
7 Dec 177754.3SelectedBishop of Le Mans, France
28 Mar 177854.6ResignedBishop of Gap, France
1 Jun 177854.7ConfirmedBishop of Le Mans, France
23 Jan 179975.4DiedBishop of Le Mans, France

MicroData Summary for François-Gaspard de Jouffroy de Gonssans:
Bishop François-Gaspard de Jouffroy de Gonssans (born , died ) Bishop of Le Mans

  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 159, and Page 431
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1774, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 20 Dec 2015