Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean des Saints

Deceased

Bishop of Meaux


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Dec 1404AppointedBishop of Gap, France
20 Aug 1409AppointedBishop of Meaux, France
20 Sep 1418DiedBishop of Meaux, France

MicroData Summary for Jean des Saints:
Bishop Jean des Saints (died ) Bishop of Meaux

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 334, and Page 514

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013