Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicolas-Augustin de la Croix d’Azolette

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Auch


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1779BornProprières
3 Aug 180627.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 Dec 183657.5SelectedBishop of Gap, France
19 May 183757.8ConfirmedBishop of Gap, France
25 Jul 183758.0Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
14 Sep 183758.2InstalledBishop of Gap, France
11 Dec 183960.4SelectedArchbishop of Auch, France
27 Apr 184060.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Auch, France
14 Aug 184061.1InstalledArchbishop of Auch, France
20 May 185676.8RetiredArchbishop of Auch, France
6 Jun 186181.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Auch, France

MicroData Summary for Nicolas-Augustin de la Croix d’Azolette:
Archbishop Nicolas-Augustin de la Croix d’Azolette (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Auch

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 98, and Page 388

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013