Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gabriel-Roch de Llobet

Deceased

Archbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1872BornPerpignan
30 May 189624.4Ordained PriestPriest of Perpignan-Elne, France
22 Jan 191543.0AppointedBishop of Gap, France
12 Apr 191543.2Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
16 Jan 192553.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France
16 Jan 192553.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Odessus
26 Apr 192553.3InstalledCoadjutor Archbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France
3 Oct 192856.7SucceededArchbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France
22 Apr 195785.3DiedArchbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France

MicroData Summary for Gabriel-Roch de Llobet:
Archbishop Gabriel-Roch de Llobet (born , died ) Archbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison)

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013