Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marie-Jean-François Allard, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Natal

Titular Archbishop of Tharona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1806BornLa Roche-de-Rame, France
15 Jun 183023.6Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
31 Jan 185144.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Natal, South Africa
31 Jan 185144.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina
13 Jul 185144.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina
11 Jun 187467.5ResignedVicar Apostolic of Natal, South Africa
23 Jun 187467.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tharona
26 Sep 188982.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Natal, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Marie-Jean-François Allard:
Archbishop Marie-Jean-François Allard O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Natal

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 38.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 496, and Page 536

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013