Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron)

Dioecesis Diniensis (-Reiensis-Sistariensis)



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • United: 15 February 1916
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Marseille
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 6,986 (2,698 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Provence-Méditerranée
  • Official Web Site: http://catho04.cef.fr/
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, 18 bl. Soustre, B.P. 67, 04002 Digne CEDEX, France
  • Telephone: 4.92.31.32.90
  • Fax: 4.92.32.21.13

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Digne
4th CenturyErectedDiocese of Digne (erected)
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Apt (suppressed) Diocese of Avignon
Diocese of Digne
29 November 1801Territory AddedArchdiocese of Embrun (suppressed) Diocese of Digne
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Gap (suppressed) Diocese of Digne
Diocese of Grenoble
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Glandèves (suppressed) Diocese of Digne
Diocese of Nice
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Riez (suppressed) Archdiocese of Aix
Diocese of Digne
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Senez (suppressed) Diocese of Digne
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Sisteron (suppressed) Diocese of Digne
Diocese of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron)
15 February 1916UnitedDiocese of Digne Diocese of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron)
8 December 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron) (from Aix)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron)
194875,00080,00093.8%170170441250346ap1951
197095,000105,00090.5%10161078876290192ap1971
1980107,000120,00089.2%8613991,08022430198ap1981
1990101,000126,00080.2%6722891,13428245198ap1991
1999110,000143,00076.9%5114651,692219153198ap2000
2000110,000139,52378.8%4915641,718423139198ap2001
2001110,000139,52378.8%4813611,803421146198ap2002
2002110,000139,52378.8%4612581,896418141198ap2003
2003110,000139,52378.8%4313561,964522149198ap2004
2004110,000139,52378.8%488561,964524159198ap2005
200696,271139,52369.0%437501,925628136198ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 12 Jun 2013