Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques-Marie de Caritat de Condorcet

Deceased

Bishop of Lisieux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1703BornCondorcet
1 Oct 174137.8SelectedBishop of Gap, France
20 Dec 174138.1ConfirmedBishop of Gap, France
28 Jan 174238.2Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
29 Jun 175450.6SelectedBishop of Auxerre, France
16 Dec 175451.0ConfirmedBishop of Auxerre, France
1 Jan 176157.1SelectedBishop of Lisieux, France
14 Feb 176157.2ResignedBishop of Auxerre, France
16 Feb 176157.2ConfirmedBishop of Lisieux, France
21 Sep 178379.8DiedBishop of Lisieux, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Marie de Caritat de Condorcet:
Bishop Jacques-Marie de Caritat de Condorcet (born , died ) Bishop of Lisieux

  • a bishop for 41.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 89, and Page 261
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 431
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1742, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015