Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Berger de Malissoles

Deceased

Bishop of Gap


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1668¹BornVienne
3 Apr 170638.2SelectedBishop of Gap, France
15 Nov 170638.8ConfirmedBishop of Gap, France
2 Jan 170739.0Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
21 Sep 173870.7DiedBishop of Gap, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François Berger de Malissoles:
Bishop François Berger de Malissoles (born 1668, died ) Bishop of Gap

  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1707
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 404
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 22 Jun 2015