Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gautier de Forcalquier

Deceased

Bishop of Gap, France


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Dec 1440AppointedBishop of Sisteron, France
17 Dec 1442AppointedBishop of Gap, France
6 Oct 1484DiedBishop of Gap, France

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Gautier de Forcalquier
Bishop Gautier de Forcalquier (died ) Bishop of Gap

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 262, and Page 239

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast