Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude de Cabannes (Chabannes)

Deceased

Bishop of Gap


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1695¹BornAix
28 Oct 173843.8SelectedBishop of Gap, France
22 Jun 173944.4ConfirmedBishop of Gap, France
9 Aug 173944.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
10 Sep 174146.6DiedBishop of Gap, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude de Cabannes (Chabannes):
Bishop Claude de Cabannes (Chabannes) (born 1695, died ) Bishop of Gap

  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 431
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015