Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Marie de Maillé de la Tour-Landry

Deceased

Bishop of Rennes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1743BornEntrammes
7 Dec 177734.0SelectedBishop of Gap, France
30 Mar 177834.3ConfirmedBishop of Gap, France
3 May 177834.4Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
1 Feb 178440.2SelectedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
25 Jun 178440.6ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
18 Sep 180157.8ResignedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
12 Apr 180258.3SelectedBishop of Rennes, France
24 Apr 180258.4ConfirmedBishop of Rennes, France
25 Nov 180461.0DiedBishop of Rennes, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Marie de Maillé de la Tour-Landry:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Marie de Maillé de la Tour-Landry (born , died ) Bishop of Rennes

  • a bishop for 26.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 319

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013