Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Troyes

Dioecesis Trecensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 4th Century
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Reims
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 6,004 (2,319 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Nord
  • Official Web Site: https://www.cathotroyes.fr/
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, 3 rue du Cloitre - Saint-Etienne, 10000 Troyes, France
  • Telephone: 3.25.80.58.30
  • Fax: 3.25.80.48.50

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
4th CenturyErectedDiocese of Troyes (erected)
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Auxerre (suppressed)
Archdiocese of Sens (suppressed)
Diocese of Troyes
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Langres (suppressed) Diocese of Dijon
Diocese of Troyes
6 October 1822Territory LostDiocese of Troyes Archdiocese of Sens
8 December 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Troyes (from Sens)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950200,000235,00085.1%2072723485456550457ap1951
1969200,000268,46074.5%1823922190480524103ap1971
1980201,000294,00068.4%145341791,12265454425ap1981
1990203,000293,00069.3%118271451,400251319425ap1991
1999220,000300,00073.3%86201062,0751430269425ap2000
2000204,600292,13170.0%85191041,9671434224425ap2001
2001205,612292,13170.4%7518932,2101428259425ap2002
2002205,612292,13170.4%88171051,958163521959ap2003
2003205,612292,13170.4%8217992,076163623159ap2004
2004205,612292,13170.4%7717942,187163613959ap2005
2010210,000296,00070.9%88231111,891203218761ap2011
2014216,800303,99771.3%6416802,710202115844ap2015
2017219,518315,00069.7%5116673,276241910043ap2018

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 493, and Page 494
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 254
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 317
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 342
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 386
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 413

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_d, v3.2.8, 23 Apr 2019; Data: 23 May 2019

Quantcast