Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arthus de Lionne

Deceased

Bishop of Gap, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1583Born
11 Apr 163955.6AppointedBishop of Gap, France
27 Nov 163956.2Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
18 May 166379.7DiedBishop of Gap, France

MicroData Summary for Arthus de Lionne
Bishop Arthus de Lionne (born , died ) Bishop of Gap

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrenoble

  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 358
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1639, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast