Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond Gaston Joseph Séguy

Bishop Emeritus of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1929 BornRieupeyroux
18 Sep 195424.8Ordained PriestPriest
14 Oct 198151.8AppointedBishop of Gap, France
22 Nov 198152.0Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
31 Jul 198757.6AppointedBishop of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny), France
8 Apr 200676.3RetiredBishop of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny), France

MicroData Summary for Raymond Gaston Joseph Séguy:
Bishop Raymond Gaston Joseph Séguy (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2006

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013