Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Cosenza-Bisignano

Archidioecesis Cosentina-Bisinianensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Francescantonio Nolè, O.F.M. Conv., Archbishop
  • Salvatore Nunnari, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 30 September 1986
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 2,537 (979 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Calabria
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesicosenza.it/
  • Mailing Address: Arcivescovado, Piazza A.G. Parrasio 16, 87100 Cosenza, Italia
  • Telephone: 0984.68.77.21
  • Fax: 0984.25.883

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Cosenza
7th CenturyErectedDiocese of Cosenza (erected)
1094Territory AddedDiocese of Amantea (suppressed) Diocese of Cosenza
Archdiocese of Cosenza
1150ElevatedDiocese of Cosenza Archdiocese of Cosenza
Archdiocese of Cosenza e Bisignano
4 April 1979UnitedArchdiocese of Cosenza
Diocese of San Marco e Bisignano
Archdiocese of Cosenza e Bisignano
Archdiocese of Cosenza-Bisignano
30 September 1986Name ChangedArchdiocese of Cosenza e Bisignano Archdiocese of Cosenza-Bisignano
30 January 2001ElevatedArchdiocese of Cosenza-Bisignano (became a Metropolitan)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Cosenza
1886140,724.0%3100100OTC
1950238,256240,65699.0%18072252945120ap1951
1969293,712294,71299.7%152852371,239113543114ap1971
Archdiocese of Cosenza e Bisignano
1980348,041349,20799.7%1721363081,130168561200ap1981
Archdiocese of Cosenza-Bisignano
1990370,981376,97098.4%1501242741,3531136548125ap1991
1999378,000380,00099.5%1331002331,62212110400124ap2000
2000372,000380,00097.9%1381002381,56311112573126ap2001
2001372,000380,00097.9%1381002381,56314113573127ap2002
2002373,000381,00097.9%1511002511,48625113590127ap2003
2003374,000382,00097.9%1541002541,47226113590126ap2004
2004377,000379,00099.5%1521002521,49625113590126ap2005
2006381,000383,00099.5%1631002631,44835113590127ap2007
2013396,000399,00099.2%156832391,6564191293132ap2014
2016378,740384,15098.6%153832361,6044390285132ap2017

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_d, v3.2.2, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 12 Aug 2018

Quantcast