Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Vairo

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Potenza-Muro Lucano-Marsico Nuovo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1917BornPaola
16 Jun 194023.4Ordained PriestPriest of Cosenza, Italy
8 Jul 196144.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cosenza, Italy
8 Jul 196144.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Uthina
20 Aug 196144.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uthina
19 Jan 196245.0AppointedBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
22 Dec 197053.9AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza, Italy
23 Dec 197154.9ResignedBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
5 Mar 197356.1AppointedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
5 Mar 197356.1AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
21 Aug 197659.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Acerenza, Italy
25 Oct 197659.8AppointedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
3 Dec 197760.9AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza, Italy
3 Dec 197760.9AppointedBishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy
3 Dec 197760.9AppointedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
12 Feb 197962.1ResignedArchbishop of Acerenza, Italy
30 Sep 198669.7AppointedArchbishop of Potenza-Muro Lucano-Marsico Nuovo, Italy
19 Jan 199376.0RetiredArchbishop of Potenza-Muro Lucano-Marsico Nuovo, Italy
25 Jul 200184.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Potenza-Muro Lucano-Marsico Nuovo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Vairo:
Archbishop Giuseppe Vairo (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Potenza-Muro Lucano-Marsico Nuovo

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 39.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013