Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincenzo Nicola Pasquale Dentice, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cosenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1741BornAquedia
Jun 1805³64.4SelectedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
26 Jun 180564.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
30 Jun 180564.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
1 Nov 180665.8DiedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Nicola Pasquale Dentice:
Archbishop Vincenzo Nicola Pasquale Dentice O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Cosenza

  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 170

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013