Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvatore Nunnari

Archbishop Emeritus of Cosenza-Bisignano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1939 BornReggio Calabria
12 Jul 196425.0Ordained PriestPriest of Reggio Calabria, Italy
30 Jan 199959.6AppointedArchbishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Conza-Nusco-Bisaccia, Italy
20 Mar 199959.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Conza-Nusco-Bisaccia, Italy
18 Dec 200465.5AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza-Bisignano, Italy
10 Aug 201071.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lungro degli Italo-Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy
12 May 201272.9ResignedApostolic Administrator of Lungro degli Italo-Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy
15 May 201575.9RetiredArchbishop of Cosenza-Bisignano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Nunnari:
Archbishop Salvatore Nunnari (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cosenza-Bisignano

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cosenza-Bisignano.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Aug 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,491
  • r: Bollettino, 15 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 15 May 2015