Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Martino Alfieri

Deceased

Archbishop of Cosenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1590³Born
15 Apr 162332.4Ordained PriestPriest
21 Aug 163443.7AppointedBishop of Isola, Italy
10 Sep 163443.8Ordained BishopBishop of Isola, Italy
20 Sep 163443.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
11 Apr 163948.4AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
13 Jun 163948.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
30 Mar 164150.3DiedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martino Alfieri (VIAF: 88672648)
Archbishop Martino Alfieri (born , died ) Archbishop of Cosenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 17.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 210, and Page 171
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 94, Number 564
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1634, Number 14
  • ob: CB, 8 Mar 2015
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 250
  • d/loc: AT, 14 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 4 Jan 2019

Quantcast