Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Rossano-Cariati

Archidioecesis Rossanensis-Cariatensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Maurizio Aloise, Archbishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 30 September 1986
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Cosenza-Bisignano
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 1,415 (546 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Calabria
  • Official Web Site: http://www.rossanocariati.it/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Arcivescovile, Via Arcivescovado 5, 87067 Corigliano Rossano [Cosenza], Italia
  • Telephone: 0983.52.02.82
  • Fax: 0983.52.50.38

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Rossano
7th CenturyErectedDiocese of Rossano (erected)
Archdiocese of Rossano
1460ElevatedDiocese of Rossano Archdiocese of Rossano
13 February 1919Territory LostDiocese of Cassano all’Jonio
Archdiocese of Rossano
Diocese of San Marco e Bisignano
Eparchy of Lungro degli Italo-Albanesi (Italo-Albanese) (erected)
Archdiocese of Rossano e Cariati
4 April 1979UnitedDiocese of Cariati
Archdiocese of Rossano
Archdiocese of Rossano e Cariati
Archdiocese of Rossano-Cariati
30 September 1986Name ChangedArchdiocese of Rossano e Cariati Archdiocese of Rossano-Cariati
30 January 2001Metropolitan ChangedArchdiocese of Rossano-Cariati (from Reggio Calabria-Bova)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Rossano
188667,357.0%159039OTC
195080,00080,000100.0%494531,50966034ap1951
1969120,600120,80099.8%5119701,722219242ap1971
Archdiocese of Rossano e Cariati
1980126,079127,97998.5%5424781,6162711357ap1981
Archdiocese of Rossano-Cariati
1990134,900135,70699.4%5619751,7982211750ap1991
1999133,500.0%571976021105ap2000*
2000133,000133,39899.7%6020801,6622110750ap2001
2001133,000133,50099.6%6021811,6412210751ap2002
2002133,000133,50099.6%6322851,5642310552ap2003
2003133,000133,50099.6%6622881,511259152ap2004
2004133,500134,00099.6%6722891,5003249152ap2005
2010135,000137,50098.2%7014841,6073158853ap2011
2014137,200139,70098.2%6620861,5952228956ap2015
2017135,000135,20099.9%6418821,6462208756ap2018
2020127,000128,25699.0%6016761,6713197056ap2021
2022118,302119,49099.0%5916751,5773187056ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Rossano
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 423, and Page 424
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 917, to Page 918
  • Archdiocese of Rossano
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 224
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 286
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 297
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 335
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 359
  • Archdiocese of Rossano-Cariati
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 79, Page 775, to Page 777
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 93, Page 337, and Page 338
  • ============

    Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
    Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
    Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
    Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
    Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
    Eastern Catholic Churches

    ============

    About Catholic-Hierarchy
    Terminology/Site Help
    [ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
    Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024