Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Piemontese, O.F.M. Conv.

Bishop of Terni-Narni-Amelia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1946 BornMonte Sant’Angelo
8 Sep 196721.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
5 Apr 197124.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
8 Oct 197731.5Professed (Perpetual Vows)Priest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
16 Apr 201468.0AppointedBishop of Terni-Narni-Amelia, Italy
21 Jun 201468.2Ordained BishopBishop of Terni-Narni-Amelia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Piemontese:
Bishop Giuseppe Piemontese O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Bishop of Terni-Narni-Amelia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Terni-Narni-Amelia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2014
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 30 Apr 2014