Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Agostino

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cosenza-Bisignano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1928BornReggio Calabria
15 Jul 195122.6Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 197345.0AppointedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
21 Dec 197345.0AppointedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
11 Feb 197445.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
30 Sep 198657.8AppointedArchbishop of Crotone-Santa Severina, Italy
6 Jun 199869.5AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza-Bisignano, Italy
18 Dec 200476.0RetiredArchbishop of Cosenza-Bisignano, Italy
24 Mar 201485.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cosenza-Bisignano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Agostino:
Archbishop Giuseppe Agostino (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cosenza-Bisignano

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 24 Mar 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015