Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eligio Caracciolo, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cosenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1654¹BornNapoli
15 Mar 169440.2AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
21 Mar 169440.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
17 Oct 170046.7DiedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eligio Caracciolo:
Archbishop Eligio Caracciolo C.R. (born 1654, died ) Archbishop of Cosenza

  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 179
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 29 Apr 2015