Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Aniello Calcara

Deceased

Archbishop of Cosenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1881Born
3 Sep 190322.5Ordained PriestPriest
30 Aug 193756.5AppointedBishop of Conza-Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Bisaccia, Italy
3 Oct 193756.6Ordained BishopBishop of Conza-Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Bisaccia, Italy
1 Jul 194059.3AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
5 Jul 196180.3DiedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Aniello Calcara
Archbishop Aniello Calcara (born , died ) Archbishop of Cosenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarcianise

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast