Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Gonzaga

Deceased

Bishop of Mantova, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1538Born
26 Feb 156122.2Elevated to Cardinal
10 Mar 156122.2InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
2 Mar 156223.2AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
16 Jul 156223.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Lorenzo in Lucina
1 Mar 156425.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
12 Jan 156526.0ResignedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
15 May 156526.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Mantova, Italy
6 Jan 156627.0DiedBishop of Mantova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Gonzaga (VIAF: 47056869)
Francesco Cardinal Gonzaga (born , died ) Bishop of Mantova

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo, Archdiocese of Palermo
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Lorenzo in Lucina, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 4.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Feb 1561
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 183
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1565, Number 34*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast